This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2020 at 05:58:21 (UTC).

SARA SUAREZ VS JAYNE PETERSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 SARA SUAREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against JAYNE PETERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9899

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUAREZ SARA

Defendants

PETERSON JAYNE

OFFICE DEPOT INC.A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAWRENCE AMY B.

ANAPOL NEIL R.

Defendant Attorneys

QUINN MONICA

QUINN MONICA M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

11/1/2019: Notice of Ruling

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/18/2020: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER - COURT'S ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AND FIFTH CAUSES OF ACTION

10/30/2019: Order - ORDER - COURT'S ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AND FIFTH CAUSES OF ACTION

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

10/16/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

10/24/2019: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

Case Management Statement

7/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

7/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

8/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MELANIE H. ROLLINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JAYNE PETERSON'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF SARA SUAREZ'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/14/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MELANIE H. ROLLINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JAYNE PETERSON'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF SARA SUAREZ'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MELANIE ROLLINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

5/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MELANIE ROLLINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

Proof of Service by Mail

5/16/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF DEFENDANT OFFICE DEPOT, INC.'S DEMURRER

5/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF DEFENDANT OFFICE DEPOT, INC.'S DEMURRER

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/3/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/21/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/21/2019: Complaint

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • Hearing02/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Hearing02/11/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Filed by Defendant Jayne Peterson, to Plaintiff Sara Suarez's Unverified Complaint;) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Sara Suarez (Plaintiff); Sara Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Office Depot, Inc.a (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Office Depot, Inc.a (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Filed by Defendant Office Depot, Inc., to Plaintiff Sara Suarez's Unverified Complaint;) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketOrder (- Court's ORDER Overruling Demurrer to the Second and Fifth Causes of Action); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Defen...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Defendant Office Depot, Inc.'s Demurrer); Filed by Office Depot, Inc.a (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( of Melanie Rollins in Support of Defendant's Demurrer); Filed by Office Depot, Inc.a (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Office Depot, Inc.a (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Office Depot, Inc.a (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sara Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sara Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sara Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE DEPOT/OFFICE MAX is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUINN MONICA M. ESQ.