This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/07/2021 at 18:36:16 (UTC).

SARA STEIN VS HENRY FRIEDMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 SARA STEIN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against HENRY FRIEDMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9278

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEIN SARA AKA SARA WATKIN

Defendants

FRIEDMAN HENRY

LAW OFFICES OF HENRY FRIEDMAN A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH GREG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

8/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sara Stein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sara Stein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Sara Stein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sara Stein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sara Stein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sara Stein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH GREG