This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 16:22:39 (UTC).

SARA SOLIS VS. AMAR PATEL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 SARA SOLIS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against AMAR PATEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6444

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLIS SARA

Defendants

PATEL BALUBHAI

PATEL AMAR

PATEL BINPIN

PATEL SMITA

PATEL VIJAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAIDAS CAROL ANN

CLARK ANDRE L.

GINKO VIKTOR VIKTOROVICH

MADAEN LAW INC

NADAEB KAWM UBC

VEGA JOYCE HOPE

Defendant Attorneys

PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE

SIMONIAN LAW APC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - RE: AMENDED DATES PURSUANT TO STIPULATION TO CONTINUE

6/18/2019: Notice of Ruling - RE: AMENDED DATES PURSUANT TO STIPULATION TO CONTINUE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF DEMAND ...)

8/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF DEMAND ...)

Order - ORDER HEARING OF 8/8/19

8/8/2019: Order - ORDER HEARING OF 8/8/19

Notice of Ruling

8/9/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion for Reconsideration

8/28/2019: Motion for Reconsideration

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/28/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Service by Mail

8/28/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/28/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Substitution of Attorney

10/10/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

10/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

10/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Declaration - DECLARATION OF G. JACQUELINE PELAEZ; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION/RELIEF

10/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF G. JACQUELINE PELAEZ; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION/RELIEF

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER ONE TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE, COMMENTS UPON EVIDENCE AND TO DIRECT WITNESSES NOT TO TESTIFY REGARDING: ALL FACTS AND DOCUMENTS NOT DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF IN R

10/24/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER ONE TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE, COMMENTS UPON EVIDENCE AND TO DIRECT WITNESSES NOT TO TESTIFY REGARDING: ALL FACTS AND DOCUMENTS NOT DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF IN R

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER TWO TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE, COMMENTS UPON EVIDENCE AND TO DIRECT WITNESSES NOT TO TESTIFY REGARDING: SETTLEMENT OFFERS AND NEGOTIATIONS; DECLARATION OF G. J

10/24/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER TWO TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE, COMMENTS UPON EVIDENCE AND TO DIRECT WITNESSES NOT TO TESTIFY REGARDING: SETTLEMENT OFFERS AND NEGOTIATIONS; DECLARATION OF G. J

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SUSAN MELTON RE NOTICE CHANGE DEPT

10/28/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SUSAN MELTON RE NOTICE CHANGE DEPT

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC AND TRIAL DATES

10/28/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC AND TRIAL DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF TO CONTINUE TRIA...)

10/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF TO CONTINUE TRIA...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION OF MISSTATEMENTS OF FACT IN PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

10/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION OF MISSTATEMENTS OF FACT IN PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Non-Jury Trial ((time estimate for trial is 4-5 days) Judge Meyers handled MSC) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (time estimate for trial is 4-5 days) Judge Me...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Non-Jury Trial ((time estimate for trial is 4-5 days)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by SARA SOLIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Non-Jury Trial ((time estimate for trial is 7 days)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (time estimate for trial is 7 days))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Non-Jury Trial ((time estimate for trial is 7 days)) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: (regarding service/answer/responsive pleading/dismissal without prejudice of defendants Vijay Patel; Binpin Patel; Smita Patel doe'd in by filing of doe amendments on 1/7/2020) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Trial Continuance); Filed by SARA SOLIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
137 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by SARA SOLIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 08/01/17 Declaration of Diligence attached ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by SARA SOLIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SARA SOLIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6444    Hearing Date: October 31, 2019    Dept: SEC

SOLIS v. PATEL

CASE NO.: ****6444

HEARING: 10/31/19

JUDGE: MARGARET M. BERNAL

#7 TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff SARA SOLIS’s (in pro per) motion for reconsideration is DENIED. CCP ;1008.

Moving Party to give Notice.

The relevant facts are as follows: On May 21, 2019 Defendant filed Motions to Compel Discovery Responses. On June 5, 2019, Plaintiff FILED and SERVED a Substitution of Attorney Form. Plaintiff declares, under penalty of perjury, that her former attorney did not inform her of the upcoming hearing date on Defendants’ Motions to Compel. On August 8, 2019, Defendants’ unopposed Motions to Compel were granted by this Court. Plaintiff now moves for reconsideration of this Court’s August 8, 2019 Order.

Under CCP ;1008, the Court may entertain a motion for reconsideration based on a showing of new or different facts, law, or circumstances. (CCP ;1008.) “When an application for an order has been made to a judge, or to a court…any party affected by the order may, within 10 days after service upon the party of written notice of entry of the order…make application to the same judge or court that made the order, to reconsider the matter and modify, amend, or revoke the prior order….” (emphasis added.) (CCP ;1008(a).)

Plaintiff’s motion is untimely. The 10-day deadline for seeking reconsideration expressly provides a 10-day time limit for a motion for reconsideration. Defendant’s Notice of Ruling on the Motions to Compel heard on August 8, 2019 were FILED and SERVED on August 9, 2019. Plaintiff’s Motion for Reconsideration was not filed until August 29, 2019.

Moreover, Plaintiff has not presented new or different facts that could not have been presented earlier. “Pro per litigants are held to the same standards as attorneys…... To say otherwise would be to give pro per litigants…an unfair advantage over parties represented by attorneys….” (Kobayashi v. Superior Court (2009) 175 Cal.App.4th 536, 543.) After Plaintiff’s Substitution of Attorney was entered on June 5, 2019, Plaintiff became responsible for the management and prosecution of her case. Plaintiff’s contention that her former attorney did not advise her of the upcoming discovery motions is not a valid ground for reconsideration.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE