This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 09:06:06 (UTC).

SARA LARIOS VS 4801 MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 SARA LARIOS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against 4801 MANAGEMENT CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1069

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARIOS SARA

Defendants

4801 MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

GREEN EARTH COLLECTIVE

GREEN EARTH VITALITY CORPORATION

LEAL ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEZA CONTRERAS NATHALIE

Defendant Attorney

GOMEZ JESSICA ALEXIS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/24/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/30/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/30/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/30/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/30/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

3/14/2022: Answer

Answer

3/14/2022: Answer

Answer

3/14/2022: Answer

Answer

3/14/2022: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

1/11/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2024
  • Hearing03/05/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2024
  • Hearing02/27/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2024
  • Hearing01/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference (MSC) scheduled for 01/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketJury Trial (5-7 Day Estimate) scheduled for 03/05/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 updated: Result Date to 06/09/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: 4801 Management Corporation (Defendant); Green Earth Collective (Defendant); Green Earth Vitality Corporation (Defendant); Alan Leal (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Sara Larios (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAddress for Nathalie Meza Contreras (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sara Larios (Plaintiff); As to: 4801 Management Corporation (Defendant); Green Earth Collective (Defendant); Green Earth Vitality Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sara Larios (Plaintiff); As to: 4801 Management Corporation (Defendant); Green Earth Collective (Defendant); Green Earth Vitality Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sara Larios (Plaintiff); As to: 4801 Management Corporation (Defendant); Green Earth Collective (Defendant); Green Earth Vitality Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick in Department 19 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 4801 MANAGEMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GREEN EARTH VITALITY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathalie Meza Contreras