This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2022 at 04:03:20 (UTC).

SARA ANDERSSON VS SOUTH WEST CONSULTING ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 SARA ANDERSSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SOUTH WEST CONSULTING ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5115

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSSON SARA

Defendants

NABATI MICHAEL

GREEN EQUITABLE SOLUTIONS

SOUTH WEST CONSULTING ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FUND CATHRYN G.

Defendant Attorney

ALAMEDDINE NATALIE RANA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/4/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/4/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/4/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/4/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

11/17/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

12/2/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/2/2022: Case Management Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Michael Nabati (Defendant); As to: Sara Andersson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Michael Nabati (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sara Andersson (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Nabati (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/27/2022; Service Cost: 80.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Sara Andersson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Sara Andersson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sara Andersson (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Nabati (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/10/2022; Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- South West Consulting Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from SOUTH WEST CONSULTING ENTERPRISES, INC., a California corporation to South West Consulting Enterprises, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketAddress for Cathryn G. Fund (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Sara Andersson (Plaintiff): First Name changed from SARA to Sara; Last Name changed from ANDERSSON to Andersson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SARA ANDERSSON (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTH WEST CONSULTING ENTERPRISES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); GREEN EQUITABLE SOLUTIONS, a California corporation (Defendant); MICHAEL NABATI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SARA ANDERSSON (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTH WEST CONSULTING ENTERPRISES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); GREEN EQUITABLE SOLUTIONS, a California corporation (Defendant); MICHAEL NABATI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SARA ANDERSSON (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTH WEST CONSULTING ENTERPRISES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); GREEN EQUITABLE SOLUTIONS, a California corporation (Defendant); MICHAEL NABATI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 17 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREEN EQUITABLE SOLUTIONS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant