Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 10:40:42 (UTC).

SAR, VASHNA VS WOODLEY, ANNETT

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 SAR, VASHNA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against WOODLEY, ANNETT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0595

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAR VASHNA

Respondent

WOODLEY ANNETT

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

6/12/2020: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

6/12/2020: Proof of Service

Minute Order

7/1/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Civil Harassment

5/20/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Denied

5/21/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Denied

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Denied

5/21/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Denied

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

5/21/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department N, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less