This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 17:17:51 (UTC).

SANTOS TORRES MURILLO, ET AL. VS PERCY THOMAS

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 SANTOS TORRES MURILLO, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PERCY THOMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0858

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA RAMIREZ VALERIA

TORRES MURILLO SANTOS

Defendants

THOMAS PERCY

DRIVETIME CAR SALES CO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERIN PAVEL

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/21/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/21/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/21/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/21/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/21/2022: Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/4/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2024
  • Hearing09/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2024
  • Hearing03/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2024
  • Hearing03/06/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: SANTOS TORRES MURILLO (Plaintiff); VALERIA GARCIA RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); As to: DriveTime Car Sales CO, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SANTOS TORRES MURILLO (Plaintiff); VALERIA GARCIA RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); As to: PERCY THOMAS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SANTOS TORRES MURILLO (Plaintiff); VALERIA GARCIA RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); As to: PERCY THOMAS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SANTOS TORRES MURILLO (Plaintiff); VALERIA GARCIA RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); As to: PERCY THOMAS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/06/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less