This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 11:44:13 (UTC).

SANTOS GUADALUPE ACOSTA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF MALIBU, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 SANTOS GUADALUPE ACOSTA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF MALIBU, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS D. LONG and CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9397

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THOMAS D. LONG

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACOSTA AN INDIVIDUAL SANTOS GUADALUPE

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF MALIBU A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY

HAGGERTY AN INDIVIDUAL WILLIAM STANLEY

STATE OF CALIFORNIA CALTRANS A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY METRO A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

J&H ENGINEERING GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC. DOE 2

TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP.

CITY OF MALIBU

STATE OF CALIFORNIA CALTRANS

HAGGERTY WILLIAM STANLEY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY METRO

J&H ENGINEERING GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TREYZON BORIS

SZKOPEK AGNES MONICA

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

D'ORO FRANK J

CITRON THOMAS HARVEY

SOLARES ERICK LEONEL

FERRANTE DAVID MICHAEL

ANIELSKI JEFFREY

CHO ANDY KWANG

ANIELSKI JEFFREY MATHEW

HSIEH STEPHANIE HWA

CHO ANDY KWANG SUK

BAKER PHILIP

OSBORN LAURENCE CARVER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/29/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/15/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

9/2/2020: Answer

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

9/2/2020: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...) OF 07/27/2020

7/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...) OF 07/27/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...)

7/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT CITY OF MALIBU'S MOTION TO TRANSFER

7/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT CITY OF MALIBU'S MOTION TO TRANSFER

Answer

7/13/2020: Answer

Answer - ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/26/2020: Answer - ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/23/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Cross-Complaint

1/23/2020: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

1/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/31/2019: Answer

Answer

12/17/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

11/22/2019: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • Hearing05/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling on CMC); Filed by Santos Guadalupe Acosta, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY (METRO) (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by J&H Engineering General Contractors, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY (METRO), a government entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by J&H Engineering General Contractors, Inc. (Doe 2) (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Santos Guadalupe Acosta, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CITY OF MALIBU, a California Municipality (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Santos Guadalupe Acosta, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Santos Guadalupe Acosta, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Santos Guadalupe Acosta, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Santos Guadalupe Acosta, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Santos Guadalupe Acosta, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Santos Guadalupe Acosta, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Santos Guadalupe Acosta, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV39397    Hearing Date: September 11, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

SANTOS GUADALUPE ACOSTA,

Plaintiff,

v.

City of malibu, ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: 19STCV39397

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

INITIAL NOTE: This is not a tentative ruling. It is being posted with the tentative rulings to give Counsel notice not to appear. This is a final order and the case is being transferred.

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 31 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE WEST DISTRICT, JUDGE CRAIG D. KARLAN presiding in DEPT. N of the SANTA MONICA Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: September 11, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J & H Engineering General Contractors Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP. A CALIF. CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF MALIBU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZKOPEK AGNES MONICA