This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2021 at 15:54:01 (UTC).

SANTOS F. ARCIA VS FOOD 4 LESS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 SANTOS F ARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3210

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCIA SANTOS F.

Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS

THE KROGER CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOURMAND JOSEPH S.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/22/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2024
  • Hearing06/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Hearing12/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Santos F. Arcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Santos F. Arcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOURMAND H. JOSEPH ESQ.