This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 13:50:28 (UTC).

SANTOS, ANTHONY -CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 SANTOS, ANTHONY -CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0915

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAGUILAN YANETH

Respondent

TABARES JACKIE

Not Classified By Court

SANTOS JESSICA

SANTOS ANTHONY

SANTOS LEOBARDO

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

SHAPIRO LEONA

SHEPPARD BRIAN JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Notice - Conservatee's Rights

3/25/2021: Notice - Conservatee's Rights

Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

3/25/2021: Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

Order - Appointing Conservator - Person Only

12/1/2020: Order - Appointing Conservator - Person Only

Doctor's Capacity Declaration

11/12/2020: Doctor's Capacity Declaration

Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook - Duties of Conservator

11/18/2020: Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook - Duties of Conservator

Minute Order

11/18/2020: Minute Order

Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination - Determination of Conservatee???s Appropriate Level of Care

11/18/2020: Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination - Determination of Conservatee???s Appropriate Level of Care

Report - Court Appointed Counsel

9/16/2020: Report - Court Appointed Counsel

Minute Order

9/17/2020: Minute Order

Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

9/10/2020: Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

Proof - Mailing - of court investigation report

8/21/2020: Proof - Mailing - of court investigation report

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel

7/22/2020: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel

Minute Order

7/23/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing

7/17/2020: Notice - Hearing

Order - Vacating Order Appointing Counsel

6/26/2020: Order - Vacating Order Appointing Counsel

Order - Appointing Counsel

6/26/2020: Order - Appointing Counsel

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

6/26/2020: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address (Yaneth Saguilan )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial) - Conservatorship; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address (Leobardo Santos )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address (Jessica Santos )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Conservatee's Rights; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Conservator (Person Only ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Conservator - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketWaived - Conservatorship Review Fee/Asssessment

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form (Leobardo Santos ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form (Yaneth Saguilan ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form (Jessica Santos ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO LEONA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEPPARD BRIAN JEFFREY