This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 00:32:35 (UTC).

SANTIAGO SANCHEZ VS DANIEL MOADDEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 SANTIAGO SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DANIEL MOADDEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1008

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ SANTIAGO

Defendants

MOADDEL DANIEL

MOADELL LAW FIRM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OKOROCHA OKORIE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/25/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

10/16/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -

10/16/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -

Complaint -

10/16/2018: Complaint -

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

10/16/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

8/28/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: RETENTION OF COURT'S JURISDICTION UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6 FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION

8/23/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: RETENTION OF COURT'S JURISDICTION UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6 FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (RE: RETENTION OF COURT'S JURISDICTION UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6 FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION); Filed by Daniel Moaddel (Defendant); Moadell Law Firm (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Santiago Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Santiago Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Santiago Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Santiago Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OKOROCHA OKORIE