Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 20:32:10 (UTC).

SANTIAGO RODRIGUEZ, ET AL. VS HOLLANDER CUSHION, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 SANTIAGO RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HOLLANDER CUSHION, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8700

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OLVERA MARIA

RODRIGUEZ SANTIAGO

DAVILA MIGUEL

GALLEGOS PASCUAL

VILLALTA OSCAR

SERRANO GLORIA

CASTILLO GUADALUPE

VEGA SALVADOR

ORDONEZ OSCAR

Defendants

SOCAL INDUSTRIAL PARTNTERS A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

HOLLANDER CUSHION A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

5/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • Hearing11/12/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Santiago Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Santiago Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Santiago Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Santiago Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Miguel Davila (Plaintiff); Maria Olvera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Santiago Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Miguel Davila (Plaintiff); Maria Olvera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Santiago Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Miguel Davila (Plaintiff); Maria Olvera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOCAL INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O