This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 07:21:01 (UTC).

SANTIAGO-CRUZ, JOSE VS SANTIAGO LOPEZ, CATALINA

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 SANTIAGO-CRUZ, JOSE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANTIAGO LOPEZ, CATALINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0726

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANTIAGO-CRUZ JOSE

Respondent

SANTIAGO LOPEZ CATALINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Sent to PS-P FE ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (Rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less