This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 01:40:41 (UTC).

SANTIAGO ALVAREZ VS BIAGI BROS., INC.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 SANTIAGO ALVAREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BIAGI BROS , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8247

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVAREZ SANTIAGO

Defendant

BIAGI BROS. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHIMMEL ALAN IRWIN

Defendant Attorney

VIRJI ARIF

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/18/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

12/20/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/20/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/13/2022

5/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/13/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • Hearing11/10/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • Hearing08/23/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 05/13/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BIAGI BROS., INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SANTIAGO ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BIAGI BROS., INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SANTIAGO ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SANTIAGO ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SANTIAGO ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SANTIAGO ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIAGI BROS. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant