This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2023 at 07:07:21 (UTC).

SANTA MONICA MALIBU PARENTS UNITED VS SANTA MONICA MALIBU UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ,ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 SANTA MONICA MALIBU PARENTS UNITED filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against SANTA MONICA MALIBU UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CRAIG D. KARLAN and ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0042

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CRAIG D. KARLAN

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SANTA MONICA MALIBU PARENTS UNITED

SOUTH BAY PARENTS PUSH BACK

Respondents

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

DRATI DR. BEN

HERMOSA BEACH CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT HBCSD

JOHNSON DR. JASON

KELLER DR. STEVEN E

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

REDONDO BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT RBUSD

SANTA MONICA MALIBU UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT SMMUSD

STOWE ED. D TIM

TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TUSD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HENDERSON TRACY L

Respondent Attorneys

WADLINGTON MARLON

LAKE ELIZABETH

RAYGOR KENT R.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION T...) OF 01/09/2023

1/9/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION T...) OF 01/09/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION T...)

1/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION T...)

Notice of Motion

12/28/2022: Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion

12/28/2022: Notice of Motion

Motion to Tax Costs

12/28/2022: Motion to Tax Costs

Motion to Tax Costs

12/28/2022: Motion to Tax Costs

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

12/15/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

12/9/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Judgment

12/6/2022: Judgment

Notice - NOTICE RULE 3.1590 STATEMENT REGARDING [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

11/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE RULE 3.1590 STATEMENT REGARDING [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

Notice of Ruling

11/8/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

11/8/2022: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: RESPONDENT LOS ANGELES COUNTY ...) OF 11/02/2022

11/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: RESPONDENT LOS ANGELES COUNTY ...) OF 11/02/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: RESPONDENT LOS ANGELES COUNTY ...)

11/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: RESPONDENT LOS ANGELES COUNTY ...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER

10/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HE...)

10/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HE...) OF 10/14/2022

10/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HE...) OF 10/14/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE - TO AMENDED C...)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE - TO AMENDED C...)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Strike Defendant California Department of Public Health's Memorandum of Costs (Filed by Plaintiff on 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Motion: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Tax Costs: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Tax Costs: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Strike Defendant California Department of Public Health's Memorandum of Costs (Filed by Plaintiff on 12/28/2022) scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Tax Costs (Filed by Plaintiff on 12/28/2022) scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION T...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION T...) of 01/09/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Santa Monica Malibu Parents United (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Santa Monica Malibu Parents United (Petitioner); South Bay Parents Push Back (Petitioner); Judge Name: Elaine W. Mandel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Docket** Case Name changed from SANTA MONICA MALIBU PARENTS UNITED, et al. vs DR. BEN DRATI, et al. to SANTA MONICA MALIBU PARENTS UNITED, SANTA MONICA MALIBU UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ,et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Docket** Case Name changed from SANTA MONICA MALIBU PARENTS UNITED, SANTA MONICA MALIBU UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ,et al. to SANTA MONICA MALIBU PARENTS UNITED VS SANTA MONICA MALIBU UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ,et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by: Santa Monica Malibu Parents United (Petitioner); South Bay Parents Push Back (Petitioner); As to: Dr. Ben Drati (Defendant); Dr. Steven E Keller (Defendant); Dr. Jason Johnson (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Santa Monica Malibu Parents United (Petitioner); South Bay Parents Push Back (Petitioner); As to: Dr. Ben Drati (Defendant); Dr. Steven E Keller (Defendant); Dr. Jason Johnson (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Santa Monica Malibu Parents United (Petitioner); South Bay Parents Push Back (Petitioner); As to: Dr. Ben Drati (Defendant); Dr. Steven E Keller (Defendant); Dr. Jason Johnson (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less