This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 11:36:04 (UTC).

SANTA MONICA KOREAN CHURCH OF CHRIST ET AL VS JAE SUNG KWAK

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 SANTA MONICA KOREAN CHURCH OF CHRIST filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against JAE SUNG KWAK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3209

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHOI TAI HI

SANTA MONICA KOREAN CHURCH OF CHRIST

Defendant

KWAK JAE SUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YUN STEPHANIE Y. ESQ.

CIANCI CHRISTOPHER CAMPBELL

Defendant Attorneys

KIM JAE SOO ESQ.

PRIETTO JAMES ANTHONY

LIAO CUAN-CHEN KALEB

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/6/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/7/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JAE SUNG KWAK'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFFS

3/9/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JAE SUNG KWAK'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFFS

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JAE SUNG KWAK'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

3/9/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JAE SUNG KWAK'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JAE SUNG KWAK'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFFS

3/15/2018: DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JAE SUNG KWAK'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFFS

DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JAE SUNG KWAK'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

3/15/2018: DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JAE SUNG KWAK'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

3/22/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/27/2018: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: DEFAMATION; BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; AND 3) DECLARATORY RELIEF

4/6/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: DEFAMATION; BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; AND 3) DECLARATORY RELIEF

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/6/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/25/2018: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/25/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

9/4/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Minute Order

11/9/2018: Minute Order

Opposition

11/9/2018: Opposition

Ex Parte Application

11/9/2018: Ex Parte Application

Order

11/9/2018: Order

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 3:06 PM in Department 57; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Proposed Order Re: Consolidation of Related Cases); Filed by Tai Hi Choi (Plaintiff); Santa Monica Korean Church of Christ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Consolidation)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Consolidation) of 05/15/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order for Department 57; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketBrief (Brief Re: Consolidation of Related Cases); Filed by Tai Hi Choi (Plaintiff); Santa Monica Korean Church of Christ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jae Sung Kwak (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 57; Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Jae Sung Kwak (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-05-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ANGIE IN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND ANTISLAPP MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Jae Sung Kwak (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Jae Sung Kwak (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Santa Monica Korean Church of Christ (Plaintiff); Tai Hi Choi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1) DEFAMATION; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

DANIEL E. PARK, State Bar No. 174524 dpark@parklawcorp.com CHRISTOPHER C. CIANCI, State Bar No. 266174 christopher@parklawcorp.com DANIEL E. PARK LAW CORPORATION 3435 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2700 Los Angeles, California 90010 Telephone: (213) 336-3767 Facsimile: (818) 479-9958

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

SANTA MONICA KOREAN

CHURCH OF CHRIST and

TAI HI CHOI FILED

S‘-é:"- ™ Coun of e ou i1ty of Los Anqeles

£C 06 3gi7

SBr;ern E Carter, &xfi-‘ ubve Officor/Clark , Ooputy

Rau! Sanchez

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES .

SANTA MONICA KOREAN CHURCH OF | CASE NO.: BC653209

CHRIST, a California Non-Profit Religious

[Assigned for All Purposes to the Honorable

Corporation; and TAI HI CHOI, an individual, | Frederick C. Shaller, Department 46]

NOTICE OF FINAL RULING ON

Plaintiffs, | DEFENDANT’S ANTI-SLAPP MOTION : TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST, VSs. | - | SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH

| - | | CAUSES OF ACTION IN THE

'JAE SUNG KWAK, an individual, and DOES | COMPLAINT

. 1-10, inclusive,

Complaint Filed:: March 9,2017

Defendant. Trial Date:

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIAO CUAN-CHEN KALEB ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRIETTO JAMES ANTHONY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JAE SOO