Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2021 at 18:20:51 (UTC).

SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT VS CLIVE WILKINSON ARCHITECTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against CLIVE WILKINSON ARCHITECTS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1637

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

CW DRIVER INC.

LPI INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CLIVE WILKINSON ARCHITECTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMS MARK S.

Defendant Attorney

SIDERMAN LORI ELLEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

3/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

3/15/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

12/10/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

12/10/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

12/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate - CERTIFICATE ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

10/29/2020: Certificate - CERTIFICATE ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/29/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/2/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Clive Wilkinson Architects, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Clive Wilkinson Architects, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Clive Wilkinson Architects, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Clive Wilkinson Architects, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Clive Wilkinson Architects, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Clive Wilkinson Architects, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate (Attorney's certificate of merit); Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LPI Inc; DBA : Tuff Spas is a litigant

Latest cases where SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where C.W. DRIVER INC. is a litigant