Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2020 at 07:13:12 (UTC).

SANJAY PATEL ET AL VS CITY OF SOUTH EL-MONTE

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 SANJAY PATEL filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CITY OF SOUTH EL-MONTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0458

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

SANJAY

PATEL SANJAY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

SOUTH EL-MONTE CITY OF

CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WEISER FRANK A. ESQ.

WEISER FRANK ALAN ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BARROW QUINN MICHAEL

LEE STEPHEN DAIFUN

PETRUSIS JENNIFER LYNN

TAYLOR ANTHONY

TRAXLER JAMIE LORRAINE

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

WEISER FRANK ALAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S APPEAL OF CITATION 1...)

6/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S APPEAL OF CITATION 1...)

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION

6/17/2020: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL; DECLARATION OF FRANK A. WEISER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/12/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL; DECLARATION OF FRANK A. WEISER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/27/2020

5/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/27/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate - CERTIFICATE CERTIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

2/21/2020: Certificate - CERTIFICATE CERTIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/30/2020

3/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/30/2020

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIP AND PROP ORDER TO CONT. HRG ON APPEAL

12/11/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIP AND PROP ORDER TO CONT. HRG ON APPEAL

Answer

4/8/2019: Answer

Response - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR; DECLARATION OF FRANK A. WEISER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/19/2019: Response - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR; DECLARATION OF FRANK A. WEISER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Cross-Complaint

3/8/2019: Cross-Complaint

Reply - Reply in Support of City's Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, etc.

1/30/2019: Reply - Reply in Support of City's Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, etc.

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/7/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice of Continuance - Defendant City of South El Monte's Notice of Continued Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear

12/13/2018: Notice of Continuance - Defendant City of South El Monte's Notice of Continued Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

12/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Request for Judicial Notice -

10/3/2018: Request for Judicial Notice -

COMPLAINT

9/4/2018: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

9/4/2018: SUMMONS -

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • Hearing07/06/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Hearing06/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference;) of 07/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Administrative Appeal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Plaintiff's Appeal of Citation 1802 Pursuant to Government Code 53069.4) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketDefendant City of South El Monte's Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief; ......; Filed by Sanjay Patel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF STEPHEN LEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketDefendant City of South EL Monte's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Notice of Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief; ......; Filed by Sanjay Patel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sanjay Patel (Plaintiff); Sanjay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESERVATION OF FEDERAL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH EL MONTE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where SANJAY A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR ANTHONY R. ESQ.