Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 08:26:39 (UTC).

SANGARY, BAHMAN VS SANGARY, SVITLANA

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 SANGARY, BAHMAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANGARY, SVITLANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8560

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANGARY BAHMAN

Respondent

SANGARY SVITLANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (REJECTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less