This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2019 at 02:54:46 (UTC).

SANG KWON LEE, ET AL. VS GLENN OYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 SANG KWON LEE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLENN OYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5268

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEE SANG KWON

LOS ANGELES MULTIETHNIC MISSION CHURCH FKA LOS ANGELES FILIPINO BAPTIST CHURCH A NON-PROFIT RELIGIOUS CORPORATION

FIRST FILIPINO BAPTIST CHURCH OF LOS ANGELES

Defendants

OYAN GLENN

CANARE RUTH

MALIKSI FELICITAS J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIM JAE SOO

KIM JAE S.

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS JOHN

LEWIS JOHN J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/16/2018: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/20/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Judicial Notice

12/26/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Motion

12/26/2018: Notice of Motion

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

12/26/2018: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/16/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Motion to Unseal Court Documents

1/17/2019: Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Motion to Unseal Court Documents

Ex Parte Application

1/17/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Release Funds of Defendant...)

1/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Release Funds of Defendant...)

Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application For a Preliminary Injunction to Enjoin Plaintiffs

1/24/2019: Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application For a Preliminary Injunction to Enjoin Plaintiffs

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For a Preliminary Injunction ...)

1/24/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For a Preliminary Injunction ...)

Opposition - Opposition to Notice of Ex Parte Motion for an Order Releasing Funds and Unsealing Court Recors

1/17/2019: Opposition - Opposition to Notice of Ex Parte Motion for an Order Releasing Funds and Unsealing Court Recors

Order - Order on Ex Parte Motion for an Order Releasing the Funds of the Los Angeles Filipino Baptist Church

1/17/2019: Order - Order on Ex Parte Motion for an Order Releasing the Funds of the Los Angeles Filipino Baptist Church

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Glenn Oyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 4:39 PM in Department 34; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sang Kwon Lee (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Multiethnic Mission Church (Plaintiff); First Filipino Baptist Church of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketReply (In Support of Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint); Filed by Glenn Oyan (Defendant); Felicitas J. Maliksi (Defendant); Ruth Canare (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Glenn Oyan (Defendant); Felicitas J. Maliksi (Defendant); Ruth Canare (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by Glenn Oyan (Defendant); Felicitas J. Maliksi (Defendant); Ruth Canare (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sang Kwon Lee (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Multiethnic Mission Church (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sang Kwon Lee (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Multiethnic Mission Church (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sang Kwon Lee (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Multiethnic Mission Church (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sang Kwon Lee (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Multiethnic Mission Church (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sang Kwon Lee (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Multiethnic Mission Church (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JAE S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JAE SOO