This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2022 at 03:58:19 (UTC).

SANDY SETSUKO FUJIMOTO VS EDWARD N MCCLURE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 SANDY SETSUKO FUJIMOTO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EDWARD N MCCLURE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0175

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUJIMOTO SANDY SETSUKO

Defendants

MCCLURE EDWARD N

UNION BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALVAREZ MARIANO

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/29/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/29/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

11/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Case Management Statement

11/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Brief - PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF RE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/22/2022: Brief - PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF RE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

11/17/2022: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

10/11/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/11/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/5/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

7/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/16/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/11/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File 585 Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File 585 Default Judgment scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 03/02/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 03/02/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Sandy Setsuko Fujimoto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S BRIEF RE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: Sandy Setsuko Fujimoto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended Complaint: Name Extension: (1st)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sandy Setsuko Fujimoto (Plaintiff); As to: Edward N McClure (Defendant); Union Bank (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sandy Setsuko Fujimoto (Plaintiff); As to: Edward N McClure (Defendant); Union Bank (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sandy Setsuko Fujimoto (Plaintiff); As to: Edward N McClure (Defendant); Union Bank (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUFG UNION BANK N.A. FKA UNION BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ MARIANO