This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2020 at 05:25:36 (UTC).

SANDY MAURICIO VS GLE-III LLC

Case Summary

On 03/19/2018 SANDY MAURICIO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLE-III LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8364

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MAURICIO SANDY

Defendants and Respondents

GLE-III LLC

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MATUSEK HENRY JOHN II ESQ.

MATUSEK HENRY JOHN II

Defendant Attorney

PLINER JESSICA STUART

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/31/2020: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/31/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

8/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/06/2020

7/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/06/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

11/26/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

12/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

12/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice of Ruling

12/27/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

1/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

1/8/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Notice of Ruling

1/9/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/26/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/22/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Proof of Personal Service

5/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/12/2019: Answer - ANSWER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS -

3/19/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3/19/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sandy Mauricio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (of Entire Case); Filed by Sandy Mauricio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Docketat 4:28 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jessica Stuart Pliner (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Gle-III, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Gle-III, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketAnswer (ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL); Filed by Gle-III, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sandy Mauricio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sandy Mauricio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698364    Hearing Date: December 26, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SANDY MAURICIO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

GLE-III, LLC, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC698364

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS’ UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 26, 2019

Plaintiff, Sandy Mauricio filed this action against Defendant, GLE-III, LLC for damages arising out of a premises liability. Plaintiff filed the lawsuit on 3/19/18. On 5/22/19, Plaintiff filed proof of service on Defendant, who then answered on 6/12/19.

At this time, Defendant moves to continue the trial date from 2/20/20 for three months. Defendant shows the continuance is necessary because it has not been able to, despite best efforts, complete all necessary discovery in the case. The parties previously stipulated to continue the trial date for five months; this motion is unopposed.

The Court finds the moving papers sufficiently show good cause to continue the trial date. Trial is normally set approximately eighteen months after the case is filed; plaintiffs are expected to serve the summons and complaint within thirty days of filing same. Thus, trial is usually held approximately seventeen months after service is complete. In this case, seventeen months after service on Defendant falls well after the requested continued trial date.

The 2/20/20 trial date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Tuesday, 5/26/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse. The 2/04/20 FSC date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Tuesday, 5/12/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3. The Court notes that Defendant asks that the FSC be heard no more than ten days prior to trial per Local Rule 3.24(f). There is no Local Rule 3.24(f). The personal injury court typically sets the FSC two weeks prior to the trial date. Unless Defendant appears and articulates a reason that the FSC should be set closer to the trial date, the FSC will be set on 5/12/20, two weeks prior to the trial.

All discovery and expert cut-offs are extended to reflect the new trial date.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.