Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 15:53:37 (UTC).

SANDY LAMONES STEVENS VS JESUS RODRIGUEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 SANDY LAMONES STEVENS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESUS RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5613

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STEVENS SANDY LAMONES

Defendants and Respondents

VARGAS MARARITA MENDEZ

VARGAS HECTOR M.

DOES 1 TO 100

RODRIGUEZ JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SUBLETTE CAMM. ESQ

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRANCINE B. KELLY & ASSOC.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/29/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

3/29/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/10/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, ADDRESS, AND TELEPHONE NUMBERS

7/18/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, ADDRESS, AND TELEPHONE NUMBERS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/14/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal ( AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address (and telephone numbers ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons ((X3) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less