This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2022 at 16:53:26 (UTC).

SANDRA SEGURA, ET AL. VS VEGA FAMILY TRUST, A REVOCABLE TRUST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 SANDRA SEGURA, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VEGA FAMILY TRUST, A REVOCABLE TRUST,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6239

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORELLA JESUS

GALARZA TORIBIO

SEGURA SANDRA

Defendants

VEGA BEATRIZ

VEGA FAMILY TRUST A REVOCABLE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPENCER CHANDRA GEHRI

INOCENTE LUIS MIGUEL

Defendant Attorney

SHAPIRO MARC S.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REFERRAL TO DEPARTMENT 1) OF 05/17/2022

5/17/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REFERRAL TO DEPARTMENT 1) OF 05/17/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REFERRAL TO DEPARTMENT 1)

5/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REFERRAL TO DEPARTMENT 1)

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

5/16/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

5/16/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/16/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

5/16/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

5/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 05/18/2022

5/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 05/18/2022

Proof of Personal Service

8/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS VEGA FAMILY TRUST, A REVOCABLE TRUST, AND BEATRIZ VEGAS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/22/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS VEGA FAMILY TRUST, A REVOCABLE TRUST, AND BEATRIZ VEGAS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2024
  • Hearing05/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2023
  • Hearing11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer DEFENDANTS VEGA FAMILY TRUST, A REVOCABLE TRUST, AND BEATRIZ VEGAS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Filed by: Vega Family Trust, a Revocable Trust (Defendant); Beatriz Vega (Defendant); As to: Sandra Segura (Plaintiff); Toribio Galarza (Plaintiff); Jesus Corella (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Vega Family Trust, a Revocable Trust (Defendant); Beatriz Vega (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sandra Segura (Plaintiff); As to: Vega Family Trust, a Revocable Trust (Defendant); Service Date: 07/27/2022; Service Cost: 185.73; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 19 - Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 05/18/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Referral to Department 1) of 05/17/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sandra Segura (Plaintiff); Toribio Galarza (Plaintiff); Jesus Corella (Plaintiff); As to: Vega Family Trust, a Revocable Trust (Defendant); Beatriz Vega (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sandra Segura (Plaintiff); Toribio Galarza (Plaintiff); Jesus Corella (Plaintiff); As to: Vega Family Trust, a Revocable Trust (Defendant); Beatriz Vega (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sandra Segura (Plaintiff); Toribio Galarza (Plaintiff); Jesus Corella (Plaintiff); As to: Vega Family Trust, a Revocable Trust (Defendant); Beatriz Vega (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO MARC S