Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 13:13:38 (UTC).

SANDRA RODRIGUEZ VS HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 SANDRA RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7751

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ SANDRA

Defendants

HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

WAGMEISTER ROBERT MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER RICHARD T

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Complaint

2/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/11/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sandra Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sandra Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sandra Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sandra Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENRY MAYO NEWHALL HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER RICHARD T