This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 18:01:40 (UTC).

SANDRA PARKER VS FPI MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 SANDRA PARKER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9542

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARKER SANDRA

Defendant

FPI MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWKINS JAMES R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 11/16/2021

11/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 11/16/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

11/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • Hearing01/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sandra Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:57 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) of 11/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sandra Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sandra Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sandra Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAWKINS JAMES ROSS