This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 11:57:12 (UTC).

SANDRA MARTINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS LA BODEGA MEAT PRODUCE NO. 2, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 SANDRA MARTINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LA BODEGA MEAT PRODUCE NO 2, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0451

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ AN INDIVIDUAL SANDRA

Defendants

DE DIOS AN INDIVIDUAL ROBERTO

LA BODEGA MEAT PRODUCE NO. 2 INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESRIANI RODNEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/24/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/22/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/22/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/30/2022: Notice - PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

10/3/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/3/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/19/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/16/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/14/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/14/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE POSSIBLE MSC)

2/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE POSSIBLE MSC)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2023
  • Hearing08/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference possible MSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference possible MSC scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 updated: Result Date to 02/22/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: SANDRA MARTINEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LA BODEGA MEAT PRODUCE NO. 2, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: SANDRA MARTINEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERTO DE DIOS, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: SANDRA MARTINEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LA BODEGA MEAT PRODUCE NO. 2, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); ROBERTO DE DIOS, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference possible MSC scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 08/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: LA BODEGA MEAT PRODUCE NO. 2, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); ROBERTO DE DIOS, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: SANDRA MARTINEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LA BODEGA MEAT PRODUCE NO. 2, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: SANDRA MARTINEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LA BODEGA MEAT PRODUCE NO. 2, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: SANDRA MARTINEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERTO DE DIOS, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SANDRA MARTINEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LA BODEGA MEAT PRODUCE NO. 2, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); ROBERTO DE DIOS, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SANDRA MARTINEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LA BODEGA MEAT PRODUCE NO. 2, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); ROBERTO DE DIOS, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SANDRA MARTINEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LA BODEGA MEAT PRODUCE NO. 2, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); ROBERTO DE DIOS, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less