This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 15:32:28 (UTC).

SANDRA K. YONTEFF VS WALMART INC.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 SANDRA K YONTEFF filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against WALMART INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3993

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YONTEFF SANDRA K.

Defendant

WALMART INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTER LEE C

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/26/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/26/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/26/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/26/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/26/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2024
  • Hearing07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2024
  • Hearing01/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sandra K. Yonteff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sandra K. Yonteff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sandra K. Yonteff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTER LEE C. ESQ.