This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 23:26:17 (UTC).

SANDRA HANSEN VS CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 SANDRA HANSEN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4776

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANSEN SANDRA

Defendants

CATHEDRAL PLAZA CAFE- GALERO GRILL THE

COMPASS GROUP USA INC.

LEVY RESTAURANTS

CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF ANGELS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTER LEE C. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SPOONER GABRIEL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

7/6/2017: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3/21/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

SUMMONS -

3/21/2017: SUMMONS -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

7/16/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/10/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

8/31/2018: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Jury Trial Georgina T. Rizk 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Georgina T. Rizk 10:00 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCase Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 528 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketProceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Georgina T. Rizk 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketDocument:OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketDocument:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 08/31/18 at 8:30 am Georgina T. Rizk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less