This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2022 at 09:01:07 (UTC).

SANDRA CEBALLOS VS GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 SANDRA CEBALLOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6255

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEBALLOS SANDRA

Defendant

GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWEN GREGORY J

Defendant Attorney

SANTA ROMANA MARK V.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/23/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/31/2019: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

2/24/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/24/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/5/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)]

5/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)]

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/22/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/13/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Hearing11/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Hearing10/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Sandra Ceballos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sandra Ceballos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sandra Ceballos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sandra Ceballos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sandra Ceballos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sandra Ceballos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANTA-ROMANA MARK VILAR