Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 03:29:34 (UTC).

SANDRA ARGUETA, ET AL. VS MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 SANDRA ARGUETA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1035

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ARGUETA SANDRA

PERLA TRACY

Respondent

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GALANG BRITTON P.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

6/15/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION FOR CASE NUMBER

6/4/2021: Petition - PETITION FOR CASE NUMBER

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2024
  • Hearing05/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Hearing12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SANDRA ARGUETA (Petitioner); TRACY PERLA (Petitioner); MARTIRES PERLA (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPetition (for Case Number); Filed by SANDRA ARGUETA (Petitioner); TRACY PERLA (Petitioner); MARTIRES PERLA (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALANG BRITTON P. ESQ.