This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2022 at 17:28:27 (UTC).

SANDRA ALBARRACIN VS ADECCO USA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 SANDRA ALBARRACIN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ADECCO USA, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5745

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALBARRACIN SANDRA

Defendants

ADECCO USA INC.

MICHAEL KORS USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARX SHERYL L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

GERSTENFELD DIANE N.

FELDMAN CATHERINE S

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/10/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/16/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/16/2022: Answer

Answer

12/19/2022: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

12/22/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

12/22/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: MICHAEL KORS (USA), INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: MICHAEL KORS (USA), INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: MICHAEL KORS (USA), INC. (Defendant); As to: SANDRA ALBARRACIN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: ADECCO USA, INC., (Defendant); As to: SANDRA ALBARRACIN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SANDRA ALBARRACIN (Plaintiff); As to: ADECCO USA, INC., (Defendant); Service Date: 11/23/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SANDRA ALBARRACIN (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL KORS (USA), INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/23/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- ADECCO USA, INC., (Defendant): Organization Name changed from ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation to ADECCO USA, INC.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- MICHAEL KORS (USA), INC. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from MICHAEL KORS (USA), INC., a Delaware corporation to MICHAEL KORS (USA), INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SANDRA ALBARRACIN (Plaintiff); As to: ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); MICHAEL KORS (USA), INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SANDRA ALBARRACIN (Plaintiff); As to: ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); MICHAEL KORS (USA), INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SANDRA ALBARRACIN (Plaintiff); As to: ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); MICHAEL KORS (USA), INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less