This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 06:02:28 (UTC).

SANDERL, ELAINE - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 SANDERL, ELAINE - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2029

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDERL MATTHEW

Not Classified By Court

SANDERL ELAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHIU KEVIN KIN

 

Court Documents

Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value - 13200 PR Code - [mailed certified copy to litigant]

3/9/2021: Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value - 13200 PR Code - [mailed certified copy to litigant]

Proposed - Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value

3/4/2021: Proposed - Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Real Property of Small Value - 13200 PR Code ([mailed certified copy to litigant] ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIU KEVIN KIN