Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2021 at 12:15:06 (UTC).

SANAZ SAMANI VS ALEXANDER STICKLEY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 SANAZ SAMANI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEXANDER STICKLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4259

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMANI SANAZ

Defendant

STICKLEY ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FROST JASON ADAMS ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/24/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/24/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/25/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/3/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2024
  • Hearing01/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • Hearing08/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Hearing07/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Alexander Stickley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alexander Stickley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Alexander Stickley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sanaz Samani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sanaz Samani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sanaz Samani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sanaz Samani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH