This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 02:18:39 (UTC).

SAN GABRIEL VALLEY COUNCIL OF GOVERNMENTS, IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ALAMEDA CORRIDOR-EAST CONSTRUCTION PROJECT VS CORPORATE LOGISTIC, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 SAN GABRIEL VALLEY COUNCIL OF GOVERNMENTS, IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ALAMEDA CORRIDOR-EAST CONSTRUCTION PROJECT filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CORPORATE LOGISTIC, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8419

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN GABRIEL VALLEY COUNCIL OF GOVERNMENTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ALAMEDA CORRIDOR-EAST CONSTRUCTION PROJECT

Defendants

CORPORATE LOGISTIC LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CTBC BACNK CORP USA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CTBC BANK CORP USA

CORPORATE LOGISTIC LLC

CUBEWORK DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MURPHY JAMES DUFF

MARIAN CYNTHIA COLLEEN

Defendant Attorney

CHAN VINCENT CHEE-KWAN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; OSC RE: PROOF OF SERVICE OF CTBC BANK CORP. AND DISMISSAL OF CTBC BANK CORP

7/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; OSC RE: PROOF OF SERVICE OF CTBC BANK CORP. AND DISMISSAL OF CTBC BANK CORP

Case Management Statement

6/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/6/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/7/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Firm Name

9/10/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/18/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/9/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION WITHIN 30-DAYS OF SERVICE (CCP 410(D)(1); DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA C. MARIAN

3/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION WITHIN 30-DAYS OF SERVICE (CCP 410(D)(1); DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA C. MARIAN

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION & NTC OF OSC & CMC

3/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION & NTC OF OSC & CMC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION, FILED...)

3/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION, FILED...)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

3/17/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA FOR AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION

4/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA FOR AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

3/25/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK CHRISTOFFELS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

3/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK CHRISTOFFELS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION

3/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Case Management Conference; OSC Re: Proof of Service of CTBC Bank Corp. and Dismissal of CTBC Bank Corp); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Deft. CTBC Bank Corp (USA))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Corporate Logistic, LLC (Defendant); Cubework (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Corporate Logistic, LLC (Defendant); Cubework (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion for Order (for Prejudgment Possession, Filed by Plaintiff San Gabriel Valley Council of Governments;) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketOrder ([Proposed] Order for Prejudgment Possession); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order for Prejudgment Possession & Ntc of OSC & CMC); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order (Amended Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Cynthia C. Marian); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketBrief (Summary of the Basis for Appraisal Opinion); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order (for Prejudgment Possession); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Deposit of Probable Compensation); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Mark Christoffels in Support of Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (Of Action [Lis Pendens]); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-East Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN GABRIEL VALLEY COUNCIL OF GOVERNMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where CHINATRUST BANK (USA) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAN VINCENT CHEE-KWAN