This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 11:41:23 (UTC).

SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS TYRONE REED LONGINO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against TYRONE REED LONGINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0809

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

LONGINO TYRONE REED DBA RIM RYDERZ DBA RIM RYDERZ

HOWARD ELVIS RAY JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLEMING SHELDON J

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

11/17/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

11/17/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

11/17/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

11/17/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

11/17/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Writ of Execution

9/13/2021: Writ of Execution

Writ - Return

9/13/2021: Writ - Return

Writ - Return

8/19/2021: Writ - Return

Writ of Execution

8/19/2021: Writ of Execution

Default Judgment

7/2/2021: Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

6/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court (Unlawful Detainer)

6/22/2021: Declaration for Default Judgment by Court (Unlawful Detainer)

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

4/6/2021: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

4/6/2021: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Proof of Service by Posting

3/11/2021: Proof of Service by Posting

Proof of Service by Posting

3/11/2021: Proof of Service by Posting

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/16/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketWrit - Return; Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketWrit - Return; Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Tyrone Reed Longino)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Elvis Ray Howard, JR.)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLEMING SHELDON J