This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2019 at 00:27:26 (UTC).

SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT CO., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS DAFANG USA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT CO , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAFANG USA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0443

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT CO. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

DAFANG USA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DAFANG SUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN CUAUHTEMOC

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE REGARDING DAFANG, USA., LLC AND SUN DAFANG

12/11/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE REGARDING DAFANG, USA., LLC AND SUN DAFANG

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

12/12/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/16/2019: Case Management Statement

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/24/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/28/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • Hearing02/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by San Gabriel Parkway Investment Co., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Due Diligence); Filed by San Gabriel Parkway Investment Co., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( of Due Diligence Regarding Dafang, USA., LLC and Sun Dafang); Filed by San Gabriel Parkway Investment Co., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by San Gabriel Parkway Investment Co., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by San Gabriel Parkway Investment Co., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by San Gabriel Parkway Investment Co., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN GABRIEL PARKWAY INVESTMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant