Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 04:07:55 (UTC).

SAMUEL YUN VS CATHERINE ATHAS

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 SAMUEL YUN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CATHERINE ATHAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3993

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YUN SAMUEL

Defendant

ATHAS CATHERINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WEINBERG YEHONATAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2024
  • Hearing01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Hearing07/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Samuel Yun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Samuel Yun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Samuel Yun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weinberg, Yehonatan S.