This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 23:35:51 (UTC).

SAMUEL WEST VS M&S VALET INC , ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 SAMUEL WEST filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against M S VALET INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3669

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST SAMUEL

Defendants

CURBSTAND INC A CORPORATION

YAMASHIRO RESTAURANT A CORPORATION

M&S VALET INC DBA CURBSTAND A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STELNICK STEFFANIE DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

11/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Samuel West (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Samuel West (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Samuel West (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Samuel West (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less