This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/05/2021 at 10:19:55 (UTC).

SAMUEL SANCHEZ VS CAMACHO AUTO SALES, AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 SAMUEL SANCHEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAMACHO AUTO SALES, AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0930

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ SAMUEL

Defendants

CAMACHO AUTO SALES AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

CAMACHO AUTO SALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORPER RENE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/6/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

8/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Samuel Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Samuel Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Samuel Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Samuel Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Samuel Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Samuel Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Samuel Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Samuel Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Samuel Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Samuel Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMACHO AUTO SALES INC. is a litigant