This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2023 at 15:39:11 (UTC).

SAMUEL RODRIGUEZ JR VS JONATHAN PONCE ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/14/2017 SAMUEL RODRIGUEZ JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JONATHAN PONCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3324

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ SAMUEL SR.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PONCE JONATHAN

BALDWIN PARK CITY OF

RIZO CAROLYN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

BALDWIN PARK CITY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BILAL KAMAL ANTOINE

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

NACIONALES-TAFOYA ROBERT M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) WITH MINOR; OR...)

1/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) WITH MINOR; OR...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) WITH MINOR; OR...) OF 01/05/2022

1/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) WITH MINOR; OR...) OF 01/05/2022

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

1/3/2022: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) WITH MINOR; OR...)

11/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) WITH MINOR; OR...)

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

10/1/2021: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

10/1/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE) OF 09/16/2021

9/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE) OF 09/16/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING O...)

8/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING O...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM

8/26/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

8/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Notice of Ruling

8/19/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) WITH MINOR)

8/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) WITH MINOR)

Notice of Ruling

7/26/2021: Notice of Ruling

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

7/26/2021: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; ORDER TO S...)

6/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; ORDER TO S...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) WITH MINOR) OF 06/04/2021

6/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) WITH MINOR) OF 06/04/2021

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/26/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) with Minor scheduled for 05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/26/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022

DocketOn the Complaint filed by SAMUEL RODRIGUEZ JR on 11/14/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Samuel Rodriguez, Jr., Samuel Rodriguez, Sr., Magali Rodriguez, and Jennifer Rodriguez as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) with Minor scheduled for 05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2022

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) with Minor; Or...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2022

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) with Minor; Or...) of 01/05/2022; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2022

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) with Minor scheduled for 01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/04/2022 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit into Blocked Account scheduled for 01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to 01/05/2022; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2022

DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by: Samuel Rodriguez, Sr. (Plaintiff); As to: Samuel Rodriguez, Jr. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) with Minor scheduled for 01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit into Blocked Account scheduled for 01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
109 More Docket Entries
03/02/2018

DocketDocument:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2018

DocketDocument:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2018

DocketDocument:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2018

DocketDocument:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2018

DocketDocument:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2017

DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 11/16/20 at 8:30 am Holly J. Fujie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2017

DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 05/14/19 at 8:30 am Holly J. Fujie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2017

DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 04/30/19 at 10:00 am Holly J. Fujie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2017

DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2017

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: ****3324 Hearing Date: September 16, 2021 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SAMUEL RODRIGUEZ JR.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

JONATHAN PONCE, et al.,

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: ****3324

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

September 16, 2021

Claimant Samuel Rodriguez Jr. (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Samuel Rodriguez, Sr. (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendant City of Baldwin Park in exchange for $17,500 and Defendant Jonathan Ponce in exchange for $15,000. If approved, $6,664.28 will be used for medical expenses and $8,125 will be used for attorney’s fees, leaving a balance of $17,710.72 for Claimant to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code ;; 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. ; 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court excuses Petitioner and Claimant from appearing.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.

'


b"

Case Number: ****3324 Hearing Date: August 23, 2021 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SAMUEL RODRIGUEZ, JR., et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

JONATHAN PONCE, et al.,

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: ****3324

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

August 23, 2021

Claimant Samuel Rodriguez Jr. (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Samuel Rodriguez Sr. (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendants Jonathan Ponce and City of Baldwin Park in exchange for $32,500. If approved, $6,664 will be used for medical expenses and $8,125 will be used for attorney’s fees, leaving a balance of $17,711 for Claimant to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code ;; 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. ; 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amount to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

However, Item 12a(2) states $0 has been paid for medical expenses even though a letter from the Department of Health Care Services states that Claimant has received $2,519.94 in benefits. In turn, although Claimant has received $2,510.94 in benefits, Item 12b(4) states that Medi-Cal has only paid $1,889.00. Lastly, Item 12a(5)(a)(i) is checked even though liens are identified in Item 12b(5)(b), including a duplicative reference to Medi-Cal's lien.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is DENIED without prejudice.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds good cause to excuse their appearances.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.

"