This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2023 at 07:42:35 (UTC).

SAMUEL PARKS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS AJJM, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 SAMUEL PARKS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against AJJM, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7946

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARKS AN INDIVIDUAL SAMUEL

Defendant

AJJM LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BOUCHE' JACQUELINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2024
  • Hearing12/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2024
  • Hearing06/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2024
  • Hearing05/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: AJJM, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: SAMUEL PARKS, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: AJJM, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SAMUEL PARKS, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: AJJM, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 12/08/2022; Service Cost: 126.93; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SAMUEL PARKS, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: AJJM, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SAMUEL PARKS, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: AJJM, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SAMUEL PARKS, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: AJJM, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less