This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2022 at 14:35:20 (UTC).

SAMUEL HOUSTON VS PARSA FEREYDOUNI

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 SAMUEL HOUSTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PARSA FEREYDOUNI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5597

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSTON SAMUEL

Defendant

FEREYDOUNI PARSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGNEW GERALD E.

Defendant Attorney

AHARONIAN RICHARD ALAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/27/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

10/27/2021: PI General Order

Answer

4/5/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

3/4/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2024
  • Hearing09/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Parsa Fereydouni (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Parsa Fereydouni (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Samuel Houston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Samuel Houston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Samuel Houston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Samuel Houston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Samuel Houston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGNEW GERALD EDWARD