This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2021 at 02:01:16 (UTC).

SAMUEL HERNANDEZ VS SPECTRA COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 SAMUEL HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SPECTRA COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9910

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ SAMUEL

Defendant

SPECTRA COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES PAUL KEITH

Defendant Attorney

ESTRADA DIANA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE PENDING MEDIATION

11/10/2021: Stipulation and Order - TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE PENDING MEDIATION

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE PENDING MEDIATION

8/10/2021: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE PENDING MEDIATION

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/1/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Appearance

3/8/2021: Notice of Appearance

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE PENDING MEDIATION

3/10/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE PENDING MEDIATION

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

12/28/2020: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Initial Status Conference Order

12/2/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

12/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 12/02/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

12/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 12/02/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

10/30/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/30/2020

10/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

10/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/16/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • Hearing01/14/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docketto Continue Initial Status Conference Pending Mediation; Filed by Samuel Hernandez (Plaintiff); Spectra Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketJoint Stipulation to Continue Initial Status Conference Pending Mediation; Filed by Samuel Hernandez (Plaintiff); Spectra Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Initial Status Conference Pending Mediation); Filed by Samuel Hernandez (Plaintiff); Spectra Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Spectra Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Samuel Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Samuel Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Samuel Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docketat 3:55 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Case Reassignment;) of 10/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Case Reassignment;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Samuel Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Samuel Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Samuel Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECTRA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESTRADA DIANA M