Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 21:50:34 (UTC).

SAMUEL GUTIERREZ, , INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MARIA GUTIERREZ VS 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 SAMUEL GUTIERREZ, , INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MARIA GUTIERREZ filed an Other lawsuit against 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0861

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUTIERREZ SAMUEL INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MARIA GUTIERREZ

Respondents

CAMBRIDGE HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC

5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET LLC DBA BRIARCREST NURSING CENTER

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'NEILL SEAN PATRICK

Respondent Attorneys

LAFFERTY KATIE E.

SMITH STEPHEN L.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/28/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

4/28/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/28/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

4/28/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

5/3/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

5/3/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/17/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • Hearing06/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Hearing06/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Hearing06/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Respondent); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Respondent); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by 5648 East Gotham Street, LLC (Respondent); Cambridge Healthcare Services, LLC (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by 5648 East Gotham Street, LLC (Respondent); Cambridge Healthcare Services, LLC (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by 5648 East Gotham Street, LLC (Respondent); Cambridge Healthcare Services, LLC (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by 5648 East Gotham Street, LLC (Respondent); Cambridge Healthcare Services, LLC (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Samuel Gutierrez, , individually and as successor in interest to Maria Gutierrez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Samuel Gutierrez, , individually and as successor in interest to Maria Gutierrez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Samuel Gutierrez, , individually and as successor in interest to Maria Gutierrez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Samuel Gutierrez, , individually and as successor in interest to Maria Gutierrez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Samuel Gutierrez, , individually and as successor in interest to Maria Gutierrez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Samuel Gutierrez, , individually and as successor in interest to Maria Gutierrez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Samuel Gutierrez, , individually and as successor in interest to Maria Gutierrez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET LLC DBA BRIARCREST NURSING CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where CAMBRIDGE HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC is a litigant