Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2020 at 11:31:28 (UTC).

SAMUEL BARRIERE VS JOSE MATA

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 SAMUEL BARRIERE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE MATA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9570

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRIERE SAMUEL

Defendant

MATA JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TISHBI PAYAM

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/12/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/26/2020: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Samuel Barriere (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Samuel Barriere (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Samuel Barriere (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Samuel Barriere (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Samuel Barriere (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less