Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 22:09:44 (UTC).

SAMSON ISAAC CHAUHAN, ET AL. VS MANCHESTER SQUARE 2, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 SAMSON ISAAC CHAUHAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MANCHESTER SQUARE 2, LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5814

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAUHAN SAMSON ISAAC

CHAUHAN SONAM SAMSON

Defendants

HOOD THOMAS M.

MANCHESTER SQUARE 2 LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGEMENT CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/20/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/27/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2024
  • Hearing04/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • Hearing10/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SAMSON ISAAC CHAUHAN (Plaintiff); SONAM SAMSON CHAUHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SAMSON ISAAC CHAUHAN (Plaintiff); SONAM SAMSON CHAUHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SAMSON ISAAC CHAUHAN (Plaintiff); SONAM SAMSON CHAUHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANCHESTER SQUARE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGEMENT CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN