This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 09:08:14 (UTC).

SAMMIE ASHER VS BAYER CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 SAMMIE ASHER filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against BAYER CORP ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7532

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASHER SAMMIE

Defendants

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

BAYER CORP.

BAYER ESSURE INC. FKA CONCEPTUS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLYNN FRANCIS J. JR.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/16/2020: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 08/18/2020

8/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 08/18/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

8/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • Docketat 2:48 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 08/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sammie Asher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sammie Asher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYER ESSURE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer Corporation is a litigant