Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2020 at 08:07:26 (UTC).

SAMI ASSASSA VS DARRYL LEE GRAY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 SAMI ASSASSA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DARRYL LEE GRAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3578

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSASSA SAMI

Defendants

GRAY DARRYL LEE

GRAY ESTELLE

GRAY JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHOUR ASHKAN A.

Defendant Attorney

HANFF ROBERT A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer

5/11/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/16/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/7/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Hearing10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Hearing09/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sami Assassa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Darryl Lee Gray (Defendant); Estelle Gray (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sami Assassa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sami Assassa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sami Assassa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANFF ROBERT ATLEE