This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 02:18:41 (UTC).

SAMAR KADI VS VALESCA BOUIMAD

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 SAMAR KADI filed an Other lawsuit against VALESCA BOUIMAD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN and BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0474

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KADI SAMAR

Defendant

BOUIMAD VALESCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAMAR STEVEN D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ALKANA EUGENE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/3/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/7/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

1/6/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/30/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/24/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Related Case

4/6/2022: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

4/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASES RE: SAM...)

4/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASES RE: SAM...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASES RE: SAM...) OF 04/29/2022

4/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASES RE: SAM...) OF 04/29/2022

Notice of Ruling

5/3/2022: Notice of Ruling

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Valesca Bouimad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (on Notice of Related Cases21STPB04420) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review on Notice of Related Cases Re: Sam...) of 04/29/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review on Notice of Related Cases Re: Sam...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Valesca Bouimad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Valesca Bouimad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Samar Kadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Samar Kadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Valesca Bouimad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Samar Kadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Samar Kadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Samar Kadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Samar Kadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAMAR, STEVEN D